MD SB801 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employee from counting in the determination of a reduction in operations if the employee accepts an offer to transfer to any other site of employment within 30 days of the offer, for the purposes of certain provisions of law; altering the persons to whom an employer is required to provide certain notice of a reduction in operations; altering the information required to be included in a certain notice of a reduction in operations; exempting an employer from a certain notice requirement under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment – Economic Stabilization Act – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-14) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507778/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1154 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commuters
Contracts
Emergencies
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Officials
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commuters
Contracts
Emergencies
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Officials
Time
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |