MD SB783 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Maryland to establish that every person has the fundamental and inalienable right to a healthful and sustainable environment; and requiring the State to serve as the trustee of the State's natural resources, including the air, land, water, wildlife, and ecosystems of the State, and to conserve, protect, and enhance the State's natural resources for the benefit of every person, including present and future generations.
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB596 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-04 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Constitutional Amendments
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Declaration of Rights | 48 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0783?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0783f.pdf |