MD SB764 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces to study the potential for conversion of vacant or underutilized commercial spaces into residential, mixed-use, and commercial spaces in order to increase the affordable housing stock in the State; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-2) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {944633/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB877 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Commercial Property
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Federal Aid
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Federal Aid
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Sunset