MD HB877 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces to study the potential for conversion of vacant or underutilized commercial spaces into residential, mix-use, and commercial spaces in order to increase the affordable housing stock in the State; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {730215/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Subjects
Commercial Property
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Federal Aid
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Federal Aid
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Leases and Rent
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Sunset