MD SB743 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a peer-to-peer car sharing program from delivering or issuing in the State a peer-to-peer car sharing program agreement containing a collision damage waiver, unless the peer-to-peer car sharing program uses a certain collision damage waiver form; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license authorizing the sale of certain insurance by the peer-to-peer car sharing program; providing that a peer-to-peer car sharing program is subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-21) (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (120-9) (Y: 121 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (116-21)
2018-04-09HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (120-9)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {423193/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-04-06HouseHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-04HouseRereferred to Economic Matters
2018-04-02HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFloor Committee Amendment {317479/1 Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {617978/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-27SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0743&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0743f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0743t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0743e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_852_sb0743e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0743_31747901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0743_61797801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0743_42319301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0743.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0743_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0995.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0743_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1405.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1455.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1456.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback