MD SB743 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for family planning services under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program by requiring the Program to provide those services beginning on January 1, 2012, to all women whose family income is at or below 200 percent of the poverty level, as permitted by federal law.
Title
Family Planning Works Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {403529/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {193429/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {403529/1 Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {193429/1 Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (113-22) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-29 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (40-6) | |
2011-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-30) | |
2011-03-27 | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-28) | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appropriations
Birth Control
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Women
Birth Control
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Women