MD SB737 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that Department of Agriculture, the Department of Natural Resources, and the Maryland Environmental Trust must allow participants in certain programs to participate in and receive compensation from certain markets, credits, or programs under certain circumstances; authorizing certain units to enter into pay-for-success contracts with certain aggregators to procure certain environmental outcomes projects or already certified environmental outcomes; etc.
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] |
Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {904630/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {234738/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB737 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Aquaculture
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay
Clams
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Contracts
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Forests and Parks
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Loans
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Oysters
Partnerships
Pollution
Power Plants
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Water
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agriculture, Department of
Appropriations
Aquaculture
Budgets
Chesapeake Bay
Clams
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Contracts
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Forests and Parks
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Loans
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Oysters
Partnerships
Pollution
Power Plants
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Sediment Control
Shore Erosion
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Water
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Work, Labor, and Employment