MD HB653 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB737
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Natural Resources, and the Maryland Environmental Trust must allow participants in certain cost-sharing programs to participate in and receive compensation from greenhouse gas markets, carbon credits, or soil carbon programs under certain circumstances; authorizing certain units to enter into pay-for-success contracts with certain aggregators to procure certain environmental outcomes projects or already certified environmental outcomes; etc.
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsors
Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153329/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB348 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
SB737 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
SB737 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Air Pollution
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Contractors
Contracts
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Environmental Trust
Farmland
Federal Aid
Fish and Fishing
Flood Control
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Inspections
Investments
Leases and Rent
Loans
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oysters
Partnerships
Plumbing
Pollution
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rural Areas
Safety
Shore Erosion
Soil Conservation
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation, Department of
Trees
Water
Water Pollution
Weather
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Wildlands
Work, Labor, and Employment
Agriculture, Department of
Air Pollution
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Contractors
Contracts
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Environmental Service, Maryland
Environmental Trust
Farmland
Federal Aid
Fish and Fishing
Flood Control
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Inspections
Investments
Leases and Rent
Loans
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Oysters
Partnerships
Plumbing
Pollution
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rural Areas
Safety
Shore Erosion
Soil Conservation
Sports and Recreation
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Time
Transportation, Department of
Trees
Water
Water Pollution
Weather
Weights and Measures
Wetlands
Wildlands
Work, Labor, and Employment