MD SB726 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering prohibited actions relating to electronic harassment of minors; prohibiting a person from maliciously engaging in electronic communication under certain circumstances with a certain intent; prohibiting a person from using an electronic communication to maliciously engage in a certain act or in a certain course of conduct; prohibiting a person from using a computer or a computer network to engage in certain activity with the intent to intimidate, torment, or harass a minor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying (Grace's Law 2.0)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {228672/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback