MD SB711 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program in the State Department of Education; authorizing the Department to provide grants to local jurisdictions or child care licensing regions to increase the supply and ensure the sustainability of family child care providers in areas with above average rates of poverty and unemployment; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, and each year thereafter, on the status of the Program and an evaluation of local pilot programs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (132-5)
2021-04-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2021-04-10HouseRereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
2021-04-09HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {364735/1 Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB944 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5113(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback