MD SB704 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for financial assistance under the Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program to include individuals who purchase certain qualified property after a qualified project is completed, at an affordable sales price as determined by certain regulations, and as an owner-occupant.
Title
Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB873 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Subjects
Boundaries
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Grants
Historical Matters
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Prices
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Grants
Historical Matters
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Loans
Prices
Residential Property
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |