MD SB625 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB30
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1213
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain circumstances under which an individual who has been convicted of a crime is not qualified for jury service; and repealing a provision made obsolete by the Act.
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {198075/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB625 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
HB260 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (37-10)
HB1213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB260 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (37-10)
HB1213 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
defendants
Ex-Offenders
Juries
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
defendants
Ex-Offenders
Juries
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |