MD SB30 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB97
Note: Carry Over of previous SB625
Note: Carry Over of previous SB625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an individual who has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment exceeding 1 year and is currently serving the sentence imposed for the conviction, including a term of parole or probation, or a crime involving or relating to witness or jury intimidation is not qualified for jury service.
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833829/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {783922/1 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {783922/1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB30 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB74 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB625 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
HB74 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB625 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |