MD HB74 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB156
Note: Carry Over of previous HB260
Note: Carry Over of previous HB260
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain circumstances under which an individual may be disqualified from jury service; providing that a person who has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment exceeding one year and is currently serving the sentence imposed for the conviction, including a term of probation, is not qualified for jury service.
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB74 (Carry Over) 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
HB260 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (37-10)
SB30 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB260 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (37-10)
SB30 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0074?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0074f.pdf |