MD SB97 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB34
Note: Carry Over of previous SB30
Note: Carry Over of previous SB30
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment exceeding 1 year and is currently serving the sentence imposed for the conviction, including a term of parole or probation, or has been convicted of a crime involving or relating to perjury, witness intimidation, jury intimidation, or fraud or a related crime is not qualified for jury service.
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment 883520/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment 643323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment 883520/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Floor Amendment 643323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-16) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {883520/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-27) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {643323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-27) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {313629/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {313629/1 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-11-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB97 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
SB30 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB156 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-17 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
SB30 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB156 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-17 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Subjects
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Ex-Offenders
Fraud
Juries
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Prisoners
Witnesses
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Ex-Offenders
Fraud
Juries
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Prisoners
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |