MD SB622 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain Medicaid funding to be used to provide community services to individuals waiting for services through certain waiver programs; authorizing certain Medicaid funding to be used for expanding provider capacity in certain waiver programs; and altering the uses of certain funding appropriated to the Dedicated Purpose Account in the fiscal year 2023 budget bill.
Title
Medicaid Waiver Programs – Waitlist and Registry Reduction (End the Wait Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {803621/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1149 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Subjects
Appropriations
Autism Spectrum
Community Facilities and Services
Education, State Department of
Governor
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Autism Spectrum
Community Facilities and Services
Education, State Department of
Governor
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 15 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |