MD SB622 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for up to $1,000 of donations of certain disposable diapers, certain hygiene products, and certain monetary gifts made by a taxpayer during the taxable year to certain qualified charitable entities; requiring the taxpayer to file certain information with the taxpayer's income tax return in order to claim the subtraction; requiring the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations and report to the General Assembly; applying the Act to certain taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {335063/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959031/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959031/1 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959031/1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB711 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Subjects
Comptroller
Exemptions
Gifts
Health
Human Services, Department of
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Taxes - Income
Exemptions
Gifts
Health
Human Services, Department of
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |