MD SB622 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified sales and use tax exemption to include the first $40 of the taxable price of any backpack or bookbag during a designated sales tax-free period for back-to-school shopping, subject to specified limitations.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Backpacks and Bookbags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-0) (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {555961/1 Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {655367/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {759138/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |