MD SB622 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to work with payors and providers to attain benchmarks for overriding a payor's step therapy or fail-first protocol; requiring the benchmarks to include, on or before July 1, 2015, establishment by a specified payor of a process for a provider to override the step therapy or fail-first protocol of the payor; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937571/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Drugs
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Records
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Records