MD SB622 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of rape in the second degree of a child under the age of 13 years; and increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of sexual offense in the second degree against a child under the age of 13 years.
Title
Crimes - Sexual Offenses Against Children - Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Larry Haines [R] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] |
Sen. Alexander Mooney [R] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (134-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-04-06 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-07 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2010-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Special Order later today (Senator Kelley) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-30 | Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |