MD SB62 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a tax-free period beginning in calendar year 2017 for the sale of emergency preparedness items; providing the 7-day period from the second Sunday in August through the following Saturday as the period during which a sales and use tax exemption for the sale of specified items is provided; requiring the Comptroller of the Treasury to publish a specified list on or before January 1, 2017; authorizing the Comptroller to amend the list of emergency preparedness equipment that is exempt from taxation for each subsequent tax-free period; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Exemptions
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Equipment
Exemptions
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use