MD SB596 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB458
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for certain changes to a certain corporation's deferred tax assets or liabilities that are the result of Chapters 341 and 342 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018; providing that the subtraction modification may be claimed only for 10 consecutive taxable years beginning with the first taxable year that begins after December 31, 2031; etc.
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB321 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB458 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
SB458 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0596?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0596f.pdf |