MD SB458 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for certain changes to a certain corporation's deferred tax assets or liabilities that are the result of Chapters 341 and 342 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018; providing for the calculation of the amount of the subtraction modification; providing that the subtraction modification may be claimed only for 10 consecutive taxable years beginning with the first taxable year that begins after December 31, 2028; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {869837/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback