MD SB595 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB260
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain persons to submit to the Public Service Commission beginning July 1, 2022, monthly reports containing information on the supply of electricity and gas to certain residential customers; requiring certain initial reports to include information from the previous 12 months; providing for the required contents of each report; requiring certain information to be organized by low-income customers and all other customers; requiring the Commission to make each report available to certain persons; etc.
Title
Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB260 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Data
Energy Matters
Fuel
Human Services, Department of
internet
Poverty
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Energy Matters
Fuel
Human Services, Department of
internet
Poverty
Reports
Residential Property
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0595?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0595f.pdf |