MD HB260 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain persons to submit to the Public Service Commission beginning July 1, 2021, monthly reports containing information on the supply of electricity and gas to certain residential customers; requiring certain initial reports to include information from the previous 12 months; providing for the required contents of each report; requiring certain information to be organized by low-income customers and all other customers; requiring the Commission to make each report available to certain persons; etc.
Title
Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633491/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB260 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Finance
SB686 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
SB686 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Subjects
Data
Energy Matters
Fuel
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Retail Sales
State Aid
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Energy Matters
Fuel
Housing
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Retail Sales
State Aid
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |