MD SB585 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the processing of poultry litter for a certain alternative use, or the resulting product, to meet certain requirements; requiring a certain product to be able to be procured and handled or applied in a certain manner for a certain purpose; authorizing the transportation of a certain alternative use product off the Delmarva Peninsula to certain markets and using a certain distribution apparatus; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB455 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB1438 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1438 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Delmarva Peninsula
Environmental Health
Litter
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Refuse Disposal
Soil Conservation
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Delmarva Peninsula
Environmental Health
Litter
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Refuse Disposal
Soil Conservation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 8 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |