MD SB576 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring or authorizing, under certain circumstances, the Maryland Stadium Authority to contract for, manage, and oversee certain public school facility projects; authorizing the Prince George's County government and Board of Education to enter into a certain public-private partnership to enhance the delivery of public school construction projects in the county; etc.
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB740 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Apprentices
Appropriations
Architects
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bonds
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Energy Matters
Engineers
Equipment
Examinations
Frederick County
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Higher Education
Howard County
Loans
Minorities
Montgomery County
Parking
Partnerships
Plumbing
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Urban Renewal
Weights and Measures
Women
Zoning and Planning
Apprentices
Appropriations
Architects
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bonds
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Development
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Energy Matters
Engineers
Equipment
Examinations
Frederick County
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Higher Education
Howard County
Loans
Minorities
Montgomery County
Parking
Partnerships
Plumbing
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Privatization
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Urban Renewal
Weights and Measures
Women
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 634 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 645 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 656 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 657 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 658.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 236 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore County | 9 | 1-104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0576?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0576f.pdf |