MD SB570 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the statewide application of provisions of law governing the towing or removal of vehicles from parking lots; establishing a motor vehicle towing, recovery, and storage lien on a towed motor vehicle on behalf of the tower or agent; authorizing a court to enter a judgment of restitution for a specified victim under specified circumstances; prohibiting a motor vehicle towing, recovery, and storage lienor from selling the motor vehicle to which the lien is attached under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Practices and Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-29 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-07 | Senators Raskin, Frosh, and Shank | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Courts
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Courts
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors