MD SB556 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Applying certain provisions of law that relate to collective bargaining for State employees to certain employees of the Maryland School for the Deaf; establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for certain faculty at the Maryland School for the Deaf; etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Maryland School for the Deaf - Application and Separate Bargaining Unit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-42) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {767470/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB837 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-01 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Laws and Ordinances
Managers and Supervisors
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Laws and Ordinances
Managers and Supervisors
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |