MD SB553 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a vehicle facing a circular green signal, a green arrow signal, or a steady yellow signal from entering an intersection if the vehicle is unable to completely proceed through the intersection; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless the approach to the intersection has certain signage installed notifying the public that a vehicle may not make a movement at the intersection that violates the Act's provisions; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB553 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
HB311 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB311 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0553?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0553f.pdf |