MD HB311 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB70

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a vehicle facing a circular green signal, a green arrow signal, or a steady yellow signal from entering an intersection if the vehicle is unable to completely proceed through the intersection; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless the approach to the intersection has certain signage installed notifying the public that a vehicle may not make a movement at the intersection that violates the Act's provisions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (100-30)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-09-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB70 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
SB553 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21202(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback