MD HB137 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB553
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-06 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-06 - Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a vehicle facing a circular green signal, a green arrow signal, or a steady yellow signal from entering an intersection if the vehicle is unable to completely proceed through the intersection; providing certain exceptions; prohibiting a police officer from issuing a citation for a violation of the Act unless the approach to the intersection has certain signage installed notifying the public that a vehicle may not make a movement at the intersection that violates the provisions of the Act; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-06 | House | Hearing 1/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-10-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB553 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB87 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB87 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0137?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0137f.pdf |