MD SB531 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "race", for the purposes of certain laws prohibiting discrimination, to include certain traits associated with race, including hair texture and certain hairstyles; and defining "protective hairstyle" as a hairstyle including braids, twists, and locks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination – Definition of Race – Hair Texture and Hairstyles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
2020-03-16SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-16SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (132-2)
2020-03-15HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (130-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {296686/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-28HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {168278/1 Adopted
2020-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-30SenateHearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-01-30SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1444 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government20101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20605(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0531?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0531f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0531t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0531e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0531_16827801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0531_29668601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0531_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0531_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0418.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0814.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0815.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0773.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback