MD HB1444 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defining "race", for the purposes of certain laws prohibiting discrimination, to include certain traits associated with race, including hair texture and certain hairstyles; and defining "protective hairstyle" as a hairstyle including braids, twists, and locks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (128-2)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB531 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government20101(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback