MD SB529 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a special fund to be used only to fund the Annapolis Art in Public Places Commission; requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a certain fund to be used only for housing assistance payments; requiring the Commission to report annually on its use of the hotel tax revenue during the preceding fiscal year to the Mayor, the City Council, and certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795861/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {559734/1 Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB901 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Hotels and Motels
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Hotels and Motels
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |