MD SB510 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to develop a scorecard to evaluate units of State government on the units' performance toward meeting certain participation goals under the Minority Business Enterprise Program and the Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Program; establishing a certain grading scale for the scorecard; and requiring grades achieved by each unit to be published each year on the Office's website.
Title
Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprises – Participation Goal Scorecard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743523/1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB816 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Minority Business Enterprises
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Women
Minority Business Enterprises
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Veterans
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |