MD SB510 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the applicability of the annual sales and use tax-free period to certain sewing items used to make clothing if the taxable price of each item is less than $100; and providing that "sewing items" include the material used to make clothing, fabric, thread zippers, bias tape and elastic, but does not include sewing machines, pins, pin cushions, scissors, or needles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - Sale of Sewing Items

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-18HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-25SenateHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-22SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11228(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback