MD SB500 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program; providing for the manner in which the Program is to be administered; providing for the powers and duties of the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under the Program; requiring, beginning on January 1, 2020, certain employees to pay the Secretary certain contributions; requiring, beginning on July 1, 2021, an individual to meet certain conditions to be eligible for benefits; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Diseases
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leave
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Prices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Spouses
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Leave
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Prices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Spouses
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment