MD SB492 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program; authorizing, rather than requiring, the Governor to appropriate at least $3,000,000 in the annual budget for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create a statewide media campaign to promote participation in career and technical education, apprenticeships, and workforce development in workforce shortage occupations; etc.
Title
Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Estates and Trusts
Governor
Grants
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Investments
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minors
News Media
Notices
Nurses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
Students
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tourism
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Agents and Brokers
Apprentices
Appropriations
Budgets
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Estates and Trusts
Governor
Grants
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Investments
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Minors
News Media
Notices
Nurses
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
Students
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Tourism
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth