MD SB492 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Public Works to collect certain information related to health care for all construction-related, competitive sealed bids for projects for a certain time period; requiring the Board to direct certain agencies to include certain information in a certain request; requiring the Board, by November 1, 2018, to report certain information to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Sustained (0-44) (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (133-1)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFloor Amendment {893121/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {144730/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-13SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0492&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0492f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0492t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_468_sb0492t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0492_14473001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0492_89312101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0016.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0492.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0492_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0647.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0492_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1256.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback