MD SB487 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a procurement officer, in an invitation for bids or a request for proposals, to include a certain summary of the factors used to determine the expected degree of minority business enterprise participation for the contract; requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in collaboration with certain entities, to adopt by regulation criteria used to determine that a prime contractor has persistently failed to meet contract goals; etc.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303627/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB389 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Industry and Technology
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Mentors
Minorities
Ombudsmen
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Transportation, Department of
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Industry and Technology
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Mentors
Minorities
Ombudsmen
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Transportation, Department of
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 16 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 303.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |