MD HB389 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a procurement officer, in an invitation for bids or a request for proposals, to include a certain summary of the factors used to determine the expected degree of minority business enterprise participation for the contract; requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in collaboration with certain entities, to adopt by regulation criteria used to determine that a prime contractor has persistently failed to meet contract goals; etc.
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713920/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB487 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Industry and Technology
internet
Mentors
Minorities
Ombudsmen
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Transportation, Department of
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Attorney General
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
Industry and Technology
internet
Mentors
Minorities
Ombudsmen
Procurement
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Transportation, Department of
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 303.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |