MD SB454 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a unit of local government to qualify for a marine contractor license; exempting an individual employed by a county or municipality in the State who performs marine contractor services while in the performance of the duties of their employment from paying a fee for the issuance or renewal of a marine contractor license or a test administered by the Marine Contractors Licensing Board; etc.
Title
Marine Contractor License - Authorization, Requirements, and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {743022/1 Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB195 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Subjects
Agriculture
Boats and Ships
Contractors
Counties
Environment
Environmental Health
Fees
Health
Highways
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Boats and Ships
Contractors
Counties
Environment
Environmental Health
Fees
Health
Highways
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 17 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |