MD SB443 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Harford County a permit to be issued by the Sheriff of Harford County that authorizes specified nonprofit organizations to conduct a gaming contest in Harford County; specifying requirements that organizations must meet to be issued a permit; authorizing a permit holder under the Act to charge only a preset entrance fee; requiring participants in a gaming contest to use tokens and not cash for wagering; requiring an individual who participates in a gaming contest to be at least 21 years of age; etc.
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {925364/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Bingo
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Forms
Gaming
Harford County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Raffles
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
Volunteers
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Auditors and Audits
Bingo
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Forms
Gaming
Harford County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Raffles
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
Volunteers