MD SB426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition in Baltimore County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB426 (Carry Over) 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
HB1436 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
HB1436 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |