MD SB413 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $2,000,000 to $8,000,000, the amount that the State Comptroller is required to distribute of certain abandoned property funds each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund.
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-38) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB514 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 17 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 11 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |