MD SB38 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain State or local fire and rescue entities to reimburse individuals who take possession of dogs formerly used in fire and rescue work under a written agreement for reasonable and necessary veterinary treatment not to exceed $2,500 per year; authorizing State fire and rescue entities to accept certain donations and requiring that the donations be disbursed to a certain fund; and authorizing local fire and rescue entities to establish a separate fund to accept public donations for the payment of certain veterinary expenses.
Title
Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703321/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |