MD SB376 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $250,000 for fiscal year 2023 for the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program Fund within the Department of Commerce to be used for loans made under the Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan Account.
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {519638/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB376 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Appropriations
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Gaming
Loans
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Time
Weights and Measures
Women
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Gaming
Loans
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Time
Weights and Measures
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |