MD SB376 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $28,500,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Carroll County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Easements
Equipment
Fire Protection
Loans
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Volunteers
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Easements
Equipment
Fire Protection
Loans
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Volunteers