MD SB325 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Dental Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2021, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2020; etc.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Electronic Government
Licenses
Names
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Electronic Government
Licenses
Names
Reports
Substance Abuse
Sunset